NY S06810 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7425
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7425
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in the case of recovery of an award from the September 11th victim compensation fund consisting solely of non-economic losses, a personal representative may file a consent to the adequacy of the award by all interested parties in lieu of a compromise proceeding.
Title
Provides that in the case of recovery of an award from the September 11th victim compensation fund consisting solely of non-economic losses, a personal representative may file a consent to the adequacy of the award by all interested parties in lieu of a compromise proceeding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7425 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1180 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07425 (Same As) 2022-09-09 - signed chap.557