NY S06805 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes variable message signs placed within the right of way of highways to display certain voting related communications; provides that no such communications shall be displayed if advised by the United States Department of Transportation or any of its agencies that the display of such information will interfere with federal law or regulation or result in the reduction of federal aid highway funds.
Title
Authorizes variable message signs placed within the right of way of highways to display certain voting related communications; provides that no such communications shall be displayed if advised by the United States Department of Transportation or any of its agencies that the display of such information will interfere with federal law or regulation or result in the reduction of federal aid highway funds.
Sponsors
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] |
Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2020-01-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.4 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-10-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09706 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - referred to transportation