NY S06800 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to treatment of gains from qualified opportunity zones in calculating taxable income; removes exclusion of gains on property in qualified opportunity zones in calculation of income.
Title
Relates to treatment of gains from qualified opportunity zones in calculating taxable income; removes exclusion of gains on property in qualified opportunity zones in calculation of income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1362 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6800A |
2022-05-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A08081 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - print number 8081a