NY S06788 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a commission to evaluate the need for community colleges to participate in the educational opportunity program.
Title
Creates a commission to evaluate the need for community colleges to participate in the educational opportunity program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2020-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.386 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6788A |
2020-01-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-10-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A02922 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education