NY S06779 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - VETOED MEMO.170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - VETOED MEMO.170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms the actions of the Panama central school district regardless of the failure of such district to timely file final building cost reports.
Title
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms the actions of the Panama central school district regardless of the failure of such district to timely file final building cost reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.170 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.627 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a8302a |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2111 |
2017-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08302 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s6779