NY S06767 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - SIGNED CHAP.141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to disclosure requirements for nursing homes as well as the requirements for incorporation of nursing homes and residential health care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to disclosure requirements for nursing homes as well as the requirements for incorporation of nursing homes and residential health care facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11AssemblySIGNED CHAP.141
2021-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2021-06-07Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.481
2021-06-07Assemblysubstituted for a7517
2021-06-01Assemblyreferred to health
2021-06-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-05-24SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1304
2021-05-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A07517 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6767

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback