NY S06766 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Grants retroactive tier IV membership in the New York city employees' retirement system to Ryan D. O'Connor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants retroactive tier IV membership in the New York city employees' retirement system to Ryan D. O'Connor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-03Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2024-06-03SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-03SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2024-06-03SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1650
2024-06-03SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2024-05-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 6766A
2024-05-17SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2023-05-09SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07281 (Same As) 2024-05-17 - print number 7281a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback