NY S06761 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends provisions allowing the county of Fulton to impose a county recording tax on obligation secured by a mortgage on real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends provisions allowing the county of Fulton to impose a county recording tax on obligation secured by a mortgage on real property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-07SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A7118
2023-05-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.974
2023-05-09SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07118 (Same As) 2023-08-23 - signed chap.300

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback