NY S06761 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reviewing suicide prevention programs periodically and making recommendations regarding cultural and linguistic competency and best practices for screening and interventions aimed at addressing suicide risk factors for minority groups and other underrepresented populations.
Title
Relates to reviewing suicide prevention programs periodically and making recommendations regarding cultural and linguistic competency and best practices for screening and interventions aimed at addressing suicide risk factors for minority groups and other underrepresented populations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2004 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6761B |
2018-06-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2018-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6761A |
2018-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2017-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08126 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES