NY S06757 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - PRINT NUMBER 6757A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - PRINT NUMBER 6757A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Ellenburg, county of Clinton as the "Samuel Trombley Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Ellenburg, county of Clinton as the "Samuel Trombley Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6757A |
2022-05-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07832 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION