NY S06756 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.333
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.333
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the one-call notification system.
Title
Relates to the one-call notification system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-05 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.333 |
2018-10-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.229 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a9985 |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.600 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6756A |
2018-02-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2105 |
2017-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A03771 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - enacting clause stricken
A09985 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - substituted by s6756a
A09985 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - substituted by s6756a