NY S06752 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a dental hygienist shall not administer local block anesthesia without a certificate and except under the personal supervision of a dentist and in conjunction with the performance of dental hygiene procedures authorized by law and in accordance with regulations promulgated by the commissioner.
Title
Provides that a dental hygienist shall not administer local block anesthesia without a certificate and except under the personal supervision of a dentist and in conjunction with the performance of dental hygiene procedures authorized by law and in accordance with regulations promulgated by the commissioner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-04-15 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6752B |
2024-03-25 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6752A |
2024-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.657 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2023-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1652 |
2023-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00284 (Same As) 2024-05-20 - reported referred to rules