NY S06749 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the confidentiality of registration records for victims of domestic violence; may be obtained by an order from supreme court, county court or family court in the county where a victim of domestic violence is registered.
Title
Relates to the confidentiality of registration records for victims of domestic violence; may be obtained by an order from supreme court, county court or family court in the county where a victim of domestic violence is registered.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.396 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.407 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a7793a |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2101 |
2017-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07793 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s6749