NY S06745 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the purposes of the Lawrence-Cedarhurst Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association, Inc.
Title
Relates to the purposes of the Lawrence-Cedarhurst Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.500 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.558 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8023 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2100 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08023 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6745