NY S06744 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7981
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7981
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the term incorrigible from certain sections of the education law.
Title
Removes the term incorrigible from certain sections of the education law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7981 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.70 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1572 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07981 (Same As) 2022-05-04 - signed chap.181