NY S06744 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - PRINT NUMBER 6744A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - PRINT NUMBER 6744A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the "detective investigators" or "rackets investigators" employed in the office of a district attorney located within the county of Nassau, the county of Suffolk, or the city of New York in the MTA Long Island Rail Road no fare program.
Title
Includes the "detective investigators" or "rackets investigators" employed in the office of a district attorney located within the county of Nassau, the county of Suffolk, or the city of New York in the MTA Long Island Rail Road no fare program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6744A |
2016-06-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-05-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09447 (Same As) 2016-03-03 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions