NY S06738 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Good Seed Church of God, Inc. to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land located in the hamlet of Islip Terrace.
Title
Authorizes the Good Seed Church of God, Inc. to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land located in the hamlet of Islip Terrace.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2016-03-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.332 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09136 (Same As) 2016-03-09 - enacting clause stricken