NY S06733 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the New York state council on the arts to award certificates of merit to artists in selected disciplines.
Title
Authorizes the New York state council on the arts to award certificates of merit to artists in selected disciplines.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1566 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-02-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09714 (Same As) 2016-05-24 - reported referred to ways and means