NY S06727 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - PRINT NUMBER 6727B
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - PRINT NUMBER 6727B
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes lactation counseling services without a referral from a physician, registered physician assistant, registered nurse practitioner, or licensed midwife.
Title
Authorizes lactation counseling services without a referral from a physician, registered physician assistant, registered nurse practitioner, or licensed midwife.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6727B |
2018-06-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6727A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08788 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES