NY S06727 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.486
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that in any proceeding alleging a muni-meter violation, it shall be an affirmative defense that the person summoned did in fact purchase muni-meter ticket prior to or contemporaneously with the issuance of the summons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that in any proceeding alleging a muni-meter violation, it shall be an affirmative defense that the person summoned did in fact purchase muni-meter ticket prior to or contemporaneously with the issuance of the summons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.486
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.303
2012-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a9353c
2012-06-12Assemblyreferred to codes
2012-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1154
2012-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2012-06-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 6727B
2012-06-04SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2012-05-07SenatePRINT NUMBER 6727A
2012-05-07SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2012-03-14SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A09353 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - substituted by s6727b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06727&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06727&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06727
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06727&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06727A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06727&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06727B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06727&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/S6727#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback