NY S06726 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - 2ND REPORT CAL.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that recovery of wages due to a clerical error by the employer or vendor of the employer is prohibited if such clerical error did not result in an overpayment or other inaccuracy in the amount of wages paid or the time in which wages were dispersed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that recovery of wages due to a clerical error by the employer or vendor of the employer is prohibited if such clerical error did not result in an overpayment or other inaccuracy in the amount of wages paid or the time in which wages were dispersed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-01-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.169
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO LABOR
2019-09-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback