NY S06725 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crime of misappropriation of payroll funds when a person knows that funds are designated for use as employee payroll funds or as payment of payroll taxes, and intentionally prevents the funds from being used for their designated purpose.
Title
Establishes the crime of misappropriation of payroll funds when a person knows that funds are designated for use as employee payroll funds or as payment of payroll taxes, and intentionally prevents the funds from being used for their designated purpose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-01-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6725A |
2020-01-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.63 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-09-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08648 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - print number 8648a