NY S06718 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the Southeast Steuben County Library with libraries eligible for the financing of projects through the dormitory authority.
Title
Includes the Southeast Steuben County Library with libraries eligible for the financing of projects through the dormitory authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.330 |
2017-09-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.634 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a8458 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2093 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08458 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s6718