NY S06718 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on December 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the disclosure of records and meetings by the port authority of New York and New Jersey to the public; provides that the state law with the greatest rights of access shall be deemed to apply where laws conflict.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the disclosure of records and meetings by the port authority of New York and New Jersey to the public; provides that the state law with the greatest rights of access shall be deemed to apply where laws conflict.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-27AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.28
2014-12-27AssemblySIGNED CHAP.534
2014-12-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2014-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.399
2014-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a8785c
2014-06-17Assemblyreferred to codes
2014-06-17AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-17SenateREPASSED SENATE
2014-06-12SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 6718C
2014-06-12SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2014-06-12Senatereturned to senate
2014-06-12AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2014-06-10Assemblyreferred to codes
2014-06-10AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-10SenateREPASSED SENATE
2014-06-02SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 6718B
2014-06-02SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2014-06-02Senatereturned to senate
2014-06-02AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2014-05-28Assemblyreferred to codes
2014-05-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-05-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-05-19SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 6718A
2014-03-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2014-03-25Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2014-03-24Senate1ST REPORT CAL.333
2014-03-03SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A08785 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s6718c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06718&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06718&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06718
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06718&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06718A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06718&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06718B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06718&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06718C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06718&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback