NY S06712 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes September twenty-second of each year as a day of commemoration known as Veteran Suicide Awareness and Remembrance Day.
Title
Establishes September twenty-second of each year as a day of commemoration known as Veteran Suicide Awareness and Remembrance Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.804 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-09-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08602 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations