NY S06710 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.542
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.542
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disability retirement benefits for sheriffs, deputy sheriffs, undersheriffs and correction officers in Nassau County.
Title
Relates to disability retirement benefits for sheriffs, deputy sheriffs, undersheriffs and correction officers in Nassau County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-29 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.542 |
2021-10-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.769 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a7342 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2021-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1403 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07342 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6710