NY S06704 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-16 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the definition of the phrase "an inducement for, or as compensation for, any title insurance business" as it relates to the prohibition against certain actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the definition of the phrase "an inducement for, or as compensation for, any title insurance business" as it relates to the prohibition against certain actions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-16Assemblyreferred to codes
2018-01-16SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-01-16SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.158
2018-01-16SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-19Assemblyreferred to insurance
2017-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1981
2017-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08467 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - committed to insurance

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback