NY S06703 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - APPROVAL MEMO.32
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - APPROVAL MEMO.32
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of New York to discontinue the use of certain parkland for the purpose of construction and operation of a pre-kindergarten center with a focus on instruction in science, technology, engineering and mathematics.
Title
Authorizes the city of New York to discontinue the use of certain parkland for the purpose of construction and operation of a pre-kindergarten center with a focus on instruction in science, technology, engineering and mathematics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.32 |
2017-11-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.450 |
2017-11-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.571 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8305a |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2088 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08305 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6703