NY S06701 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - PRINT NUMBER 6701B
Pending: Senate Internet and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the New York privacy act to require companies to disclose their methods of de-identifying personal information, to place special safeguards around data sharing and to allow consumers to obtain the names of all entities with whom their information is shared.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the New York privacy act to require companies to disclose their methods of de-identifying personal information, to place special safeguards around data sharing and to allow consumers to obtain the names of all entities with whom their information is shared.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-31SenatePRINT NUMBER 6701B
2022-05-31SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY
2022-02-08SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY
2022-01-06SenatePRINT NUMBER 6701A
2022-01-06SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2022-01-05SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2021-06-10SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2021-05-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-05-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-05-18Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1080
2021-05-12SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A00680 (Same As) 2022-01-07 - print number 680b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback