NY S06691 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the disposal of drugs, drug disposal sites and home pharmaceutical collection.
Title
Relates to the disposal of drugs, drug disposal sites and home pharmaceutical collection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.305 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.117 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | substituted for a1609 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2014-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.499 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A01609 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - substituted by s6691