NY S06689 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.240
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.240
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to not for profit pharmacies operated by an institution of higher education; requires policies issued by a Medicaid managed care provider to consider such pharmacies to be in the provider's pharmacy network.
Title
Relates to not for profit pharmacies operated by an institution of higher education; requires policies issued by a Medicaid managed care provider to consider such pharmacies to be in the provider's pharmacy network.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.240 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.614 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7922a |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1934 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07922 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6689