NY S06677 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - PRINT NUMBER 6677A
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - PRINT NUMBER 6677A
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "gender identity respect, dignity and safety act"; relates to the treatment and placement of incarcerated individuals based upon gender identity; requires that incarcerated individuals in state and local correctional facilities who have a gender identity different from their assigned sex at birth be addressed and have access to commissary items, clothing and other materials that are consistent with the person's gender identity; establishes that incarcerated individuals shall be presumptively placed in a correctional facility with persons of the gender that most closely aligns with such person's self-attested gender identity unless the person opts out of such placement.
Title
Enacts the "gender identity respect, dignity and safety act"; relates to the treatment and placement of incarcerated individuals based upon gender identity; requires that incarcerated individuals in state and local correctional facilities who have a gender identity different from their assigned sex at birth be addressed and have access to commissary items, clothing and other materials that are consistent with the person's gender identity; establishes that incarcerated individuals shall be presumptively placed in a correctional facility with persons of the gender that most closely aligns with such person's self-attested gender identity unless the person opts out of such placement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6677A |
2022-04-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2021-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A07001 (Same As) 2022-03-08 - reported referred to codes