NY S06677 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8457
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8457
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in the event that certain lands cease to be used exclusively by the International Boxing Hall of Fame for the purposes of developing, expanding and operating a boxing hall of fame and museum and are not developed by July 31, 2023, title to such lands and any improvements thereon shall revert to the state of New York.
Title
Provides that in the event that certain lands cease to be used exclusively by the International Boxing Hall of Fame for the purposes of developing, expanding and operating a boxing hall of fame and museum and are not developed by July 31, 2023, title to such lands and any improvements thereon shall revert to the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8457 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.682 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1833 |
2017-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08457 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.129