NY S06674 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7790A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands insurance coverage requirements for human donor milk; removes the requirement for inpatient use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands insurance coverage requirements for human donor milk; removes the requirement for inpatient use.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-28SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A7790A
2024-05-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-16SenateAMENDED (T) 6674A
2024-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1163
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-06-08Assemblyreferred to insurance
2023-06-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1264
2023-05-04SenateREFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES

Same As/Similar To

A07790 (Same As) 2024-05-28 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback