NY S06673 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of "Blue Star Mother" and "Blue Star Family" distinctive license plates for parents and family members of active duty service members; establishes the "blue star mothers and families support fund".
Title
Authorizes the issuance of "Blue Star Mother" and "Blue Star Family" distinctive license plates for parents and family members of active duty service members; establishes the "blue star mothers and families support fund".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1272 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08249 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to transportation