NY S06668 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on August 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the eligibility period for indigent legal service attorneys to receive certain loan forgiveness and increases loan reimbursement for certain attorneys who work in legal services with indigent clients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands the eligibility period for indigent legal service attorneys to receive certain loan forgiveness and increases loan reimbursement for certain attorneys who work in legal services with indigent clients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2019-08-23SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08644 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback