NY S06665 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.395
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.395
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reporting by the superintendent of financial services; requires a report on the number of new insureds, non-renewed insureds and business written by each insurer and the reasons in the aggregate for the non-renewal of policies to be provided to the speaker of the assembly, the temporary president of the senate, the chair of the assembly insurance committee, and the chair of the senate insurance committee on or before June thirtieth, two thousand twenty and every two years thereafter.
Title
Relates to reporting by the superintendent of financial services; requires a report on the number of new insureds, non-renewed insureds and business written by each insurer and the reasons in the aggregate for the non-renewal of policies to be provided to the speaker of the assembly, the temporary president of the senate, the chair of the assembly insurance committee, and the chair of the senate insurance committee on or before June thirtieth, two thousand twenty and every two years thereafter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.395 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.628 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a8306 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1975 |
2017-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08306 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s6665