NY S06664 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-11 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-11 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a green development home tax exemption authorizing a 35% exemption from local real property taxation for homes that are part of green developments as LEED certified or certified by the national association of home builders.
Title
Establishes a green development home tax exemption authorizing a 35% exemption from local real property taxation for homes that are part of green developments as LEED certified or certified by the national association of home builders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2012-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.959 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10739 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - referred to real property taxation