NY S06651 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-06 - PRINT NUMBER 6651B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-06 - PRINT NUMBER 6651B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a cost-of-living adjustment for New York public retirement systems.
Title
Provides a cost-of-living adjustment for New York public retirement systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6651B |
2022-01-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6651A |
2021-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10058 (Same As) 2022-04-29 - referred to governmental employees