NY S06642 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.327
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the city of Schenectady to alienate certain parcels of land used as parkland and to acquire other parcels of land to replace such parkland and acquire other parcels of land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the city of Schenectady to alienate certain parcels of land used as parkland and to acquire other parcels of land to replace such parkland and acquire other parcels of land.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-13AssemblySIGNED CHAP.327
2017-09-01SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.574
2017-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a8347
2017-06-15Assemblyreferred to cities
2017-06-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-15SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2017-06-15SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1831
2017-06-09SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08347 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6642

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback