NY S06635 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain unappropriated state land at the Industrial Residential Center in the town of Rush to Monroe county.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain unappropriated state land at the Industrial Residential Center in the town of Rush to Monroe county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.304 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.357 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a8842a |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-05-28 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6635A |
2014-05-28 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-28 | Senate | returned to senate |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-04-30 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-03-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.230 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08842 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6635a