NY S06627 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-06 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes and directs the New York state power authority to rename the Robert Moses Niagara Power Plant located in the town of Lewiston, county of Niagara, to the Shirley J. Hamilton Niagara Power Plant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes and directs the New York state power authority to rename the Robert Moses Niagara Power Plant located in the town of Lewiston, county of Niagara, to the Shirley J. Hamilton Niagara Power Plant.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-06SenateRECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-06-08Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2023-06-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1238
2023-05-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 6627A
2023-05-09SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2023-05-02SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback