NY S06622 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - SIGNED CHAP.202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows Brian Laurange Jr. to be eligible to take the civil service exam for the position of deputy sheriff for the Columbia County Sheriff's Office and be eligible to be placed on the eligible list for appointment as a full-time deputy sheriff for the Columbia County Sheriff's Office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows Brian Laurange Jr. to be eligible to take the civil service exam for the position of deputy sheriff for the Columbia County Sheriff's Office and be eligible to be placed on the eligible list for appointment as a full-time deputy sheriff for the Columbia County Sheriff's Office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-19SenateSIGNED CHAP.202
2023-07-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-09Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-09Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-09Assemblyhome rule request
2023-06-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.769
2023-06-09Assemblysubstituted for a6723a
2023-06-08Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-06-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-08SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2023-06-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1762
2023-06-08SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 6622A
2023-05-16SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2023-05-01SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06723 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - substituted by s6622a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback