NY S06619 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.520
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.520
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to public hearing requirements before a gas or electric corporation closes a call center.
Title
Relates to public hearing requirements before a gas or electric corporation closes a call center.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. George Maziarz [R] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Terry Gipson [D] |
Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. Jack Martins [R] | Sen. Cecilia Tkaczyk [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.520 |
2014-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.845 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a9104a |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2014-03-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-03-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-03-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6619A |
2014-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.188 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09104 (Same As) 2014-06-09 - substituted by s6619a