NY S06617 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Passed on September 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-22 - SIGNED CHAP.355
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Passed on September 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-22 - SIGNED CHAP.355
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to future climate risk and/or sea level rise projections and other weather-related data.
Title
Relates to future climate risk and/or sea level rise projections and other weather-related data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.355 |
2014-09-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.306 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a6558b |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6617B |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.623 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6617A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06558 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6617b