NY S06615 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - SIGNED CHAP.39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the reporting of performance metrics by the MTA of all services provided by New York city transit authority subways and Long Island rail road and Metro-North commuter railroad trains (Part A); relates to the description of the central business district (Part B); relates to the MTA's reorganization plan (Part C); relates to removing caps on automated enforcement cameras for bus lanes; bus lane photo devices (Part D); relates to the membership of the metropolitan transportation authority; one member may be the director of the division of budget (Part E); relates to switching from the STAR tax exemption to the STAR tax credit (Part G); establishes the empire state entertainment diversity job training development fund (Subpart A); and modifies the definition of a qualified film production facility (Subpart B)(Part H); exempts from tax a portion of global intangible low-taxed income (Part I); modifies the definition of vendor and marketplace provider and increases the cumulative total of a person's gross receipts from sales of property delivered in the state from three hundred thousand to one million dollars (Part J); relates to issuance of bonds and notes; relates to capital grants (Part K); extends the award dates for authorized amounts to be awarded pursuant to applications submitted in response to the request for application number 17648 to September 1, 2019 (Part L); relates to the definition of an authorized entity that may utilize design-build contracts (Part M); makes technical corrections to the "Jose Peralta New York state DREAM act" (Part N); relates to mass transit access for LaGuardia airport (Part O); limits the rate of interest on any judgment or accrued claim against the authority arising out of condemnation proceedings to six percent (Part P); relates to making certain technical corrections to chapter 36 of the laws of 2019 relating to rent control (Part Q); relates to the operational expenses of certain gaming facilities (Part R); relates to video lottery gaming in Orange county (Part S); and increases the number of supreme court judges and county court judges in certain jurisdictions (Part T).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the reporting of performance metrics by the MTA of all services provided by New York city transit authority subways and Long Island rail road and Metro-North commuter railroad trains (Part A); relates to the description of the central business district (Part B); relates to the MTA's reorganization plan (Part C); relates to removing caps on automated enforcement cameras for bus lanes; bus lane photo devices (Part D); relates to the membership of the metropolitan transportation authority; one member may be the director of the division of budget (Part E); relates to switching from the STAR tax exemption to the STAR tax credit (Part G); establishes the empire state entertainment diversity job training development fund (Subpart A); and modifies the definition of a qualified film production facility (Subpart B)(Part H); exempts from tax a portion of global intangible low-taxed income (Part I); modifies the definition of vendor and marketplace provider and increases the cumulative total of a person's gross receipts from sales of property delivered in the state from three hundred thousand to one million dollars (Part J); relates to issuance of bonds and notes; relates to capital grants (Part K); extends the award dates for authorized amounts to be awarded pursuant to applications submitted in response to the request for application number 17648 to September 1, 2019 (Part L); relates to the definition of an authorized entity that may utilize design-build contracts (Part M); makes technical corrections to the "Jose Peralta New York state DREAM act" (Part N); relates to mass transit access for LaGuardia airport (Part O); limits the rate of interest on any judgment or accrued claim against the authority arising out of condemnation proceedings to six percent (Part P); relates to making certain technical corrections to chapter 36 of the laws of 2019 relating to rent control (Part Q); relates to the operational expenses of certain gaming facilities (Part R); relates to video lottery gaming in Orange county (Part S); and increases the number of supreme court judges and county court judges in certain jurisdictions (Part T).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24AssemblySIGNED CHAP.39
2019-06-24SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblymessage of necessity - 3 day message
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.699
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a8433
2019-06-20Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-20SenateMESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE
2019-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1846
2019-06-20SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A08433 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6615

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback