NY S06613 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the possession and harboring of killer whales in aquariums and sea parks; makes the violation of such provisions punishable by a fine of up to $2,500 and fines of $5,000 per day such violation continues after the sixtieth day.
Title
Prohibits the possession and harboring of killer whales in aquariums and sea parks; makes the violation of such provisions punishable by a fine of up to $2,500 and fines of $5,000 per day such violation continues after the sixtieth day.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Ball [R] | Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] | Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6613A |
2014-03-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.343 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08832 (Same As) 2014-05-12 - print number 8832a