NY S06609 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - SIGNED CHAP.140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - SIGNED CHAP.140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to buildings that are part of urban development action area projects that have been rehabilitated with the aid of a loan from a municipality.
Title
Extends provisions relating to buildings that are part of urban development action area projects that have been rehabilitated with the aid of a loan from a municipality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.140 |
2021-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.497 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a7665 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1120 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A07665 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6609