NY S06608 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to accessing records under the freedom of information law including notification procedures and the release of names of natural persons and residential addresses.
Title
Relates to accessing records under the freedom of information law including notification procedures and the release of names of natural persons and residential addresses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.314 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6608B |
2020-01-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6608A |
2019-06-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00119 (Same As) 2020-02-27 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS