NY S06600 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7491A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7491A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to SUNY admission requirements for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs; removes the requirement for a minimum score on the graduate record examination or similar examination.
Title
Relates to SUNY admission requirements for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs; removes the requirement for a minimum score on the graduate record examination or similar examination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7491A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1701 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6600A |
2021-05-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07491 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - signed chap.620